Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Congressional Districts - Standards and Process
Sponsored by
Delegates Gutierrez, Atterbeary, Carr, Carter, Flanagan, Fraser-Hidalgo, Ghrist, Glass, Hill, C. Howard, Kelly, Kittleman, Korman, Krebs, Lam, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Otto, Parrott, Pena-Melnyk, B. Robinson, Smith, Sophocleus, Tarlau, Turner, A. Washington, and West
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding a new article to the Maryland Constitution to govern congressional districts; requiring congressional districts to conform to specified standards and that due regard be given to specified boundaries; requiring the Governor to prepare a congressional districting plan following each decennial census of the United States and after public hearings; requiring the Governor to present the plan to the presiding officers of the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0448
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/23/2015 2/23/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/23/2015 2/23/2015 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM