Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Towne Centre at Laurel - Class A License PG 316-15
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Veto sustained (0-141)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum number of specified Class A alcoholic beverages licenses in Prince George's County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to convert a specified Class B-DD alcoholic beverages license to be a specified Class A alcoholic beverages license to be issued to an establishment located within the Towne Centre at Laurel; and prohibiting the Board of License Commissioners from issuing more than a specified number of Class B-DD (Development District) licenses under specified circumstances.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0423
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-141)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {503698/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/13/2016 Veto sustained (0-141)
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments {503698/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Special Order until later today (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 51
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 51
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
Senate 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM