Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a court to issue a permanent final protective order against an individual who is sentenced to serve, instead of who served, a term of imprisonment of at least 5 years for specified crimes under specified circumstances; adding the crime of assault in the second degree to the list of crimes, the commission of which subjects an individual to the issuance of a permanent final protective order against the individual in specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0417
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {272915/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {358676/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Delegates Rosenberg, Carter, and Parrott
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Senators Forehand, Getty, and Frosh
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Favorable with Amendments {272915/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 50
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 50
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable with Amendments {358676/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) 63
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 House Requests Senate Recede 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Delegates Rosenberg, Carter, and Parrott 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Senate Refuses to Recede 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Senators Forehand, Getty, and Frosh 68
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-203 )
(   4-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM