Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Boards of Education - Anonymous Two-Way Text Messaging Tip Programs
Sponsored by
Delegates Arentz, Carey, Cassilly, Folden, Ghrist, Hornberger, Jacobs, Mautz, W. Miller, and Otto
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each local board of education to establish an anonymous two-way text messaging tip program; establishing the purpose of the two-way text messaging tip program; requiring each board of education to publicize the two-way text messaging tip program in specified locations and venues; requiring the completion of a victim of bullying, harassment, or intimidation report form and the provision of a specified transcript to a specified person on receipt of a report of any act of bullying, harassment, or intimidation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-424, 7-424.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM