Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Regulations Impacting Small Businesses - Economic Impact Analyses
Sponsored by
Delegates Brooks, Atterbeary, D. Barnes, Bromwell, Glenn, Hettleman, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Jones, Lafferty, J. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Queen, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Sydnor, Turner, Valderrama, Wilkins, P. Young, Angel, Barron, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Pendergrass, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Szeliga, West, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain units to make a certain certification regarding certain local regulations; requiring the Department of Budget and management to provide training to certain units on the preparation of certain economic analyses; requiring certain units to establish a certain electronic registry and to post on the registry a proposed regulation that has a significant small business impact; requiring certain units to create certain compliance guides to assist small businesses to comply with certain regulations; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1082
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {196180/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Text - First - State Government - Regulations Impacting Small Businesses - Economic Impact Analyses
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {196180/1 Adopted 48
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - State Government - Regulations Impacting Small Businesses - Economic Impact Analyses
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48C
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-1001, 10-110, 10-224, 2-1505.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM