Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Opioid Maintenance Programs - Licensing
Sponsored by
Delegate M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that regulations adopted by the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene include a requirement that the process for approval of a license for an opioid maintenance program include the number of existing slots in programs in a catchment area and the number of individuals in need of specified services in a catchment area, the severity of drug-related crime in a catchment area, the population at risk of opioid addiction in a catchment area, and the need for an opiod maintenance program in a specified catchment area; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/02/2015 3/02/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM