Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex Offenders
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Barkley, Gutierrez, Lam, R. Lewis, and Stein
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a registered sex offender who applies for admission to a nursing home or an assisted living program to notify the nursing home or assisted living program, prior to admission if feasible, that the registrant is a registered sex offender in the State; altering the information to be included in a registration statement; prohibiting a facility from knowingly employing an identified registrant; requiring a facility to check the Sex Offender Registry on a certain website for certain purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex Offenders
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex Offenders
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-705, 11-706, 11-708 )
(   19-2601 through 19-2604 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM