Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Agricultural and Conservation Property Interests - Solar Facilities (Right to Solar Farm)
Sponsored by
Delegates Barve, Davis, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Gilchrist, Hixson, Jalisi, Robinson, and Stein
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting a specified facility that generates electricity by utilizing solar energy from specified development restrictions under an agricultural land preservation easement; altering the limitation on the percentage of the land subject to an agricultural land preservation easement that may be used for the generation of electricity from solar energy; and authorizing the Maryland Environmental Trust to lease properties for the generation of electricity under specified circumstances.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - State Agricultural and Conservation Property Interests - Solar Facilities (Right to Solar Farm)
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-513 )
(   3-208, 5-9A-05 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM