Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Distribution of Marriage Ceremony Fees
Sponsored by
Delegate West
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Making specified marriage ceremony fees nonrefundable and payable before a marriage license is issued; reducing a marriage ceremony fee in Cecil County; altering a requirement that specified clerks retain and distribute marriage ceremony fees in a specified manner; requiring that specified clerks pay marriage ceremony fees to the State Comptroller to be used in a specified manner; requiring the recipients of marriage ceremony fees to report annually on the use of the fees; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1047
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Distribution of Marriage Ceremony Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Distribution of Marriage Ceremony Fees
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-410 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM