Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Collective Bargaining - Memorandum of Understanding - Continuation
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Miller, B. Barnes, Haynes, Jones, Korman, Krimm, McIntosh, Reznik, Sophocleus, Tarlau, P. Young, and Jackson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a memorandum of understanding agreed to and ratified under certain provisions of law from expiring until it is succeeded by a memorandum of understanding agreed to and ratified under certain provisions of law; requiring that the terms of a certain memorandum of understanding continue in force and effect until a certain memorandum of understanding is agreed to and ratified; authorizing an exclusive representative to file a certain action in a circuit court under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0654
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Collective Bargaining - Memorandum of Understanding - Continuation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {444863/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {433920/2 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (49-84)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Collective Bargaining - Memorandum of Understanding - Continuation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-47)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Collective Bargaining - Memorandum of Understanding - Continuation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Collective Bargaining - Memorandum of Understanding - Continuation
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {444863/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Floor Amendment {433920/2 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (49-84) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Collective Bargaining - Memorandum of Understanding - Continuation
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (88-47) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/21/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/19/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23
Text - Chapter - Collective Bargaining - Memorandum of Understanding - Continuation
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page