Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Table Game Proceeds - Recreational Facilities and School Programs
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Ali, and Gibson
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the requirement that proceeds from certain table games paid to Baltimore City be used for certain purposes to include funding the operation of recreational facilities beyond the hours in effect as of January 1, 2016, and for after-school and summer school programs in Baltimore City public schools.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0805
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore City - Table Game Proceeds - Recreational Facilities and School Programs
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM