Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Dually Enrolled Students - In-State and In-County Tuition
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaiser, Barkley, Bobo, Cane, Carr, Cullison, Feldman, Healey, Hixson, Hucker, Ivey, Kramer, Lee, Luedtke, A. Miller, Mizeur, Murphy, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Valderrama, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that specified dually enrolled students, including undocumented immigrants, shall receive specified tuition rates; establishing that specified individuals shall be eligible to pay in-state and in-county tuition rates at public institutions of higher education under specified circumstances; requiring the governing board of each public institution of higher education to adopt specified policies; and defining terms.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-106.9 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM