Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2015
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Afzali, Atterbeary, Barkley, Campos, Carter, Cluster, Folden, Fraser-Hidalgo, Glass, Jalisi, Krebs, Lam, Lierman, McComas, Moon, Morales, Pendergrass, Platt, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Smith, Stein, Sydnor, Valentino-Smith, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an individual who is convicted of a specified alcohol offense to participate in the Ignition Interlock System Program for specified periods of time and to successfully complete the Program; requiring the Administration to suspend for an indefinite period, rather than revoke, the license of an individual who is convicted of a specified alcohol offense; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/13/2015 Text - First - Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2015
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-404.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM