Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Divided Highways - Speed Limits and Crosswalks
Sponsored by
Delegates Conway, Arentz, Cane, Eckardt, Otto, Proctor, Rudolph, and Smigiel
Status
In the Senate - Senate Refuses to Recede
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that, on a divided highway that has traffic lights located in specified areas, each intersection that has a traffic light may also have a crosswalk through the divided highway; altering the maximum speed limit on specified divided highways in specified areas; requiring the State Highway Administration or a local jurisdiction to give specified notice to specified members of the General Assembly before increasing the speed limit above a specified threshold on specified highways; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1001
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {770110/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {690316/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {278673/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Delegates Stein, O'Donnell, and Frush
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments {770110/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 46
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Floor Committee Amendment {690316/1 Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 48A
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments {278673/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 60
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 67
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 House Requests Senate Recede 67
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 67
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Delegates Stein, O'Donnell, and Frush 67
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Senate Refuses to Recede 65
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-801.1, 8-631 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM