Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks
Sponsored by
Delegates Long, Adams, Angel, Bromwell, Buckel, Carozza, Cassilly, Cluster, Glass, Grammer, Hixson, Hornberger, S. Howard, Kipke, Kittleman, Lam, Mautz, McDonough, Metzgar, Miele, Morgan, and Parrott
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Designating, beginning in calendar year 2015, the last 7 days of August through the first 7 days of September of each year to be tax-free periods during which an exemption from the sales and use tax is provided for the sale of specified textbooks purchased by specified individuals; designating in calendar year 2016 an additional tax-free period during the last 14 days of January for return-to-school shopping in Maryland; and defining specified terms.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0665
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-232 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM