Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Sentences
Sponsored by
Delegates Hettleman, Barron, Dumais, Healey, Impallaria, Korman, R. Lewis, Love, Moon, Mosby, Stewart, Washington, Wilkins, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the penalties for manufacturing, distributing, dispensing, and possessing certain amounts of certain controlled dangerous substances, acting as a "drug kingpin", and committing a subsequent violation of the prohibition against manufacturing, distributing, dispensing, or possessing with intent to distribute a controlled dangerous substance in a certain school vehicle or in, on, or within a certain distance of certain school property.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Crimes - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Sentences
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Crimes - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Sentences
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-612, 5-613, 5-627 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM