Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Public Charter School Act of 2017
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Buckel, Carozza, Clark, Cluster, Flanagan, Folden, Ghrist, Glass, Hornberger, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McDonough, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, Morgan, Otto, Parrott, Reilly, Rey, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vogt, West, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Public Charter School Authority as a public chartering authority under the Maryland Public Charter School Program; specifying that employees of a public charter school authorized by the Authority are not public school employees, are exempt from State teacher certification requirements, and may refuse to join employee organizations; requiring the Authority to adopt specified policies regarding teacher induction, preparation, and development; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0704
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Charter School Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Charter School Act of 2017
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-202, 9-101, 9-102, 9-102.1, 9-102.2, 9-102.3, 9-103, 9-103.1, 9-104, 9-104.1, 9-105, 9-105.1, 9-106, 9-106.1, 9-107, 9-108 through 9-111, 9-112 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:32 AM