Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Human Services - Family Connects Home Visiting Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Ivey, and Williams
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Family Connects Home Visiting Pilot Program in Prince George's County to provide, improve, and study the effects of home visiting services for eligible households; defining "eligible household" as one located in Prince George's County that has a newborn who was delivered at a certain hospital; requiring the Prince George's County Department of Family Services, along with the Prince George's Child Resource Center, to begin the selection of eligible households to participate in the Program on or before September 1, 2020; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Prince George's County - Human Services - Family Connects Home Visiting Pilot Program
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   8-1301 through 8-1305 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:10 PM
Click to return on the top page