Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegate Cullison
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland to study access to dental services for all State residents, identify areas of the State lacking in dental services for a significant number of people and identify barriers to receiving dental services; requiring the Task Force to submit a final report of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the Senate Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee by December 1, 2019; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0544
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Occupations – Advanced Practice Dental Hygiene
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {576187/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48B
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Occupations – Advanced Practice Dental Hygiene
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {576187/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48B
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM