Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Frush
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Agriculture, on or before July 1, 2016, to conduct a comprehensive assessment of the impacts of climate change on agriculture in the State; requiring the University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science to establish specified sea level rise projections; requiring the Secretary of Natural Resources to update Maryland Environmental Policy Act guidelines; altering the State's Economic Growth, Resource Protection, and Planning Policy to include the consideration of climate change risks; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0256
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-108 )
(   2-1212 )
(   3-602.3, 5-7A-01 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM