Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Haynes, and Sophocleus
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing an Earned Income Disregard Pilot Program within the Family Investment Program; requiring the Department of Human Resources to select one rural county and one urban or suburban county for participation in the Pilot Program; requiring a county that participates in the Pilot Program to administer benefits under the Family Investment Program in a specified manner; altering the amount of earned income that is disregarded under the Pilot Program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0686
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301, 5-310, 5-310.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM