Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations - Political Expenditures - Stockholder Approval
Sponsored by
Delegates Platt, Barron, Carr, Clippinger, Cullison, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gutierrez, Hixson, Jalisi, Korman, Lam, Luedtke, McCray, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Patterson, S. Robinson, Smith, Tarlau, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a corporation from using any money or other property of the corporation in connection with a political expenditure unless the stockholders, by a majority vote, have authorized in advance the amount of money or property to be used and directed that the money or property be used for specified purposes; requiring specified notices and reporting about political expenditures; authorizing the Attorney General to bring a civil action to obtain specified remedies for a violation of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0153
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM