Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Chesapeake Bay - Vessel Sewage Discharge Areas
Sponsored by
Delegates S. Howard, Arentz, Carey, Chang, Clark, Ghrist, Jacobs, McConkey, Morgan, Saab, Simonaire, and Sophocleus
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment, in conjunction with the Department of Natural Resources, to designate areas in the Chesapeake Bay and its tributary waters where a vessel may discharge sewage; and requiring a specified vessel operator and lessee to ensure that the discharge of sewage from specified vessels takes place in specified areas.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Chesapeake Bay - Vessel Sewage Discharge Areas
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Environment - Chesapeake Bay - Vessel Sewage Discharge Areas
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-11A-01 )
(   8-701, 8-741 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM