Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass Murder
Sponsored by
Delegates Shoemaker, Buckel, Afzali, Folden, Krebs, Malone, McComas, Morgan, Reilly, Rose, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a person who is convicted of murder in the first degree may be sentenced to death under certain circumstances; providing that the murder of a law enforcement officer, a correctional officer, a certain first responder, or a certain witness, or a certain mass murder, under certain circumstances, is an aggravating circumstance that the court or jury must consider in making a determination as to the imposition of the death penalty; establishing procedures for the imposition of the death penalty; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass Murder
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-901 through 3-909, 4-101, 4-305, 6-112, 7-301 )
(   12-307, 3-8A-03, 3-8A-06, 8-404, 8-420, 9-204 )
(   14-101, 2-201, 2-202, 2-301, 2-303, 2-304, 2-305, 2-401 )
(   11-404, 3-105, 3-106, 3-107, 4-204, 5-101, 7-101, 7-103, 7-107, 7-201 through 7-204, 8-108 )
(   16-812 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM