Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Expensing of Business Property and Bonus Depreciation - Recoupling With Federal Law
Sponsored by
Delegates Morgan, Anderton, Aumann, Buckel, Cassilly, Clark, Folden, Ghrist, S. Howard, Impallaria, Malone, McComas, Metzgar, W. Miller, Otto, Parrott, Reilly, Rey, Saab, West, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing Maryland income tax modifications for specified deductions for the cost of business property that is treated as an expense for federal income tax purposes; repealing Maryland income tax modifications for a specified additional depreciation allowance under the federal income tax for specified business property; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0424 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Expensing of Business Property and Bonus Depreciation - Recoupling With Federal Law
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-210.1, 10-310 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM