Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Marijuana Laws - Full Disclosure of Legal, Employment, and Health Risks
Sponsored by
Delegates Impallaria, Boteler, Braveboy, Elliott, Frank, Glass, Hough, K. Kelly, Krebs, McComas, McDermott, W. Miller, Norman, Otto, Parrott, Ready, Schulz, Stocksdale, Szeliga, Wilson, and Wood
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of the Attorney General, at least 90 days before the implementation of any law that reduces penalties for or legalizes the use of marijuana, to establish a specified system to notify the public of the risks related to the change in the law.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM