Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Companies - Customers - Security Deposits
Sponsored by
Delegate M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an electric company to notify customers regarding the reasons for which a customer may be required to pay a security deposit by prominently publishing notice in specified manners; requiring an electric company to give written notice to an existing customer at least 30 days before imposing a security deposit; requiring the notice to include specified information; and requiring an electric company to attempt to work with a customer to avoid imposing a security deposit during a specified period.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM