Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegates McDonough, Glass, Kach, Kipke, Krebs, McComas, Norman, and Parrott
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that, on or before July 1, 2013, a county or municipality subject to a specified municipal stormwater permit adopt and implement laws or ordinances to establish a watershed protection and restoration program; repealing the requirement that a county or municipality maintain or administer a local watershed protection and restoration fund; repealing the requirement that a county or municipality establish and annually collect a stormwater remediation fee; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-201.1, 4-202.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM