Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class DBR License - Minimum Capital Investment
Sponsored by
Delegate Reilly
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Permitting the holder of a Class DBR license in Harford County to sell beer brewed at the brewery to the extent provided by a certain other license; and requiring the holder of a Class DBR license to make a minimum capital investment of $250,000 for new improvements to the facility and new equipment to be used on the premises; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class DBR License - Minimum Capital Investment
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-102, 22-403 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM