Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Issuance, Renewal, and Expiration
Sponsored by
Delegates Gutierrez, Braveboy, Carr, Cullison, Dumais, Ivey, A. Kelly, Lee, Luedtke, Pena-Melnyk, S. Robinson, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending to July 1, 2023, the date after which the Motor Vehicle Administration may not issue or renew an identification card, a moped operator's permit, or a license to drive that is not acceptable by federal agencies for official purposes; and providing for expiration dates for identification cards, moped operators' permits, or licenses to drive that are not acceptable by federal agencies for official purposes.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Reassigned to Judiciary
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 Reassigned to Judiciary 24
House 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-122 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM