Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary, Morales, Anderson, Conaway, Folden, Kelly, Lierman, Lisanti, McComas, Moon, Pendergrass, Rosenberg, Smith, Sydnor, Turner, Valderrama, B. Wilson, and C. Wilson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting, subject to a specified exception, an individual under the age of 18 from marrying; and authorizing an individual 16 or 17 years old to marry under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {492713/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-17)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {492713/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (119-17) 51
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 49
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-301, 2-402, 2-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM