Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Opportunity Zone Employers - Formerly Incarcerated Individuals
Sponsored by
Delegate Haynes
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing certain employers operating in an opportunity zone in the State a credit against the Maryland income tax if the employer hires a formerly incarcerated individual during the taxable year; establishing the amount of the credit as $1,000 per qualified employee; prohibiting an employer from claiming the credit under certain circumstances; prohibiting the carryforward of the credit; making the credit refundable for certain tax exempt employers; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Opportunity Zone Employers - Formerly Incarcerated Individuals
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-749 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM