Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Certificate of a Qualified Expert - Lead Paint Poisoning Claims
Sponsored by
Delegate Niemann
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the court to dismiss a specified claim filed in a circuit court or a United States District Court against a person for injury caused by the ingestion of lead-based paint or lead-contaminated dust if the claimant does not file a certificate of a qualified expert for each defendant; specifying the contents of the certificate; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Reassigned to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Reassigned to Environmental Matters 25
House 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2013 3/22/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-2D-01 through 3-2D-04 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM