Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Applicability and Registration Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Beidle, Glenn, Holmes, McMillan, Norman, and Weir
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the application of specified provisions of law relating to reducing lead risk in housing; requiring specified owners to register specified properties built between January 1, 1950 and December 31, 1977, both inclusive, in a specified manner; providing civil penalties for registration violations; providing a registration fee for specified property; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Reassigned to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Reassigned to Environmental Matters 25
House 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2013 3/22/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-801, 6-803, 6-811.1, 6-817, 6-819, 6-843 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM