Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegate Kelly
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the prohibition on the neglect or refusal, by a specified adult child, to provide a destitute parent with food, shelter, care, and clothing; altering the definition of "responsible relative", as it relates to responsibility for the cost of specified services provided in a facility or program operated or funded by the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, to exclude from the definition the children of a recipient of specified services; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0272
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0816 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-101 through 13-103, 13-106 through 13-109 )
(   16-101, 16-102, 16-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM