Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Our House Youth Home
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaiser, Luedtke, and Queen
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Bond Bill Fact Sheet
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $200,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of Our House Youth Home, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, site improvement, and capital equipping of a new dormitory at Our House Youth Home, located in Montgomery County; requiring the grantee to provide and expend a matching fund; providing the fund may consist of real property or funds expended prior to the effective date of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0796
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2019 were amended into the State's Capital budget (SB 186). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended SB 186 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Our House Youth Home
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 5:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Our House Youth Home
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing 3/10 at 5:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM