Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Speed Monitoring Systems - Local Jurisdictions
Sponsored by
Delegates Malone, McMillan, and Conaway
Status
In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the standards and requirements for the required warning period for violations recorded by speed monitoring systems; establishing that speed monitoring systems placed in specified areas may only be placed on highways with a specified minimum speed limit; applying notice and signage standards for unmanned local stationary speed monitoring systems to all local speed monitoring systems; requiring local jurisdictions to designate specified persons to act in a liaison capacity; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {970416/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Smigiel) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Conaway) {883227/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Special Order until next session (Delegate Smigiel) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {900617/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Smigiel) {223226/1 Rejected (50-81)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Glass) {963726/1 Rejected (49-80)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Delegate Glass) Rejected (39-77)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-28)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {638777/1
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {638777/1
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Motion Special Order until 11:30 PM (Senator Pipkin) Rejected (19-28)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/07/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {638777/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/07/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {603623/1
Proceedings
69
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments {970416/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Special Order until later today (Delegate Smigiel) Adopted 62
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate Conaway) {883227/1 Adopted 62
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Special Order until next session (Delegate Smigiel) Adopted 62
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Floor Committee Amendment {900617/1 Adopted 63
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate Smigiel) {223226/1 Rejected (50-81) 63
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate Glass) {963726/1 Rejected (49-80) 63
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Delegate Glass) Rejected (39-77) 63
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed (111-28) 64
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments {638777/1 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments {638777/1 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Motion Special Order until 11:30 PM (Senator Pipkin) Rejected (19-28) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/07/2013 Favorable with Amendments {638777/1 Report Adopted 69
Senate 4/08/2013 4/07/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {603623/1 69
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-809 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM