Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hospitals – Changes in Status – Notification and Approval
Sponsored by
Delegates Metzgar, Jacobs, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a hospital, if the hospital is seeking to close, partially close, downsize, merge, or delicense and workers may be displaced, to provide at least 90 days' notice to certain entities, a certain community, and affected workers; providing for the content of a certain notice; requiring approval by the Maryland Department of Health, the Maryland Health Care Commission, and the Health Services Cost Review Commission before a hospital closes, partially closes, downsizes, merges, or is delicensed under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Hospitals – Changes in Status – Notification and Approval
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Hospitals – Changes in Status – Notification and Approval
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/04 at 3:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-326.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM