Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax - Notice of Tax Bill Address Change - Prohibition of Sale
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Carter, and Oaks
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing an owner of residential real property in Baltimore City to request that real property tax notices be sent to a specified address; requiring Baltimore City to send a specified notice to an owner of real property after a specified request has been made; requiring the notice to the owner of real property to contain specified information; requiring Baltimore City to send real property tax notices in accordance with a specified request if no objections are raised by the owner of the real property; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0179
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2014 2/17/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-808, 6-205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM