Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Energy Efficiency and Demand Management Programs and Services - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott, Buckel, Kittleman, Metzgar, and Otto
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions requiring the Public Service Commission to make specified yearly calculations, require gas companies and electric companies to establish specified programs and services, adopt specified rate-making policies, and ensure that the adoption of electric customer choice does not adversely impact the continuation of specified programs; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2015 3/17/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-20B-05 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM