Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - In-State Tuition for Military Veterans
Sponsored by
Delegates Stifler and Kaiser
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering provisions of law concerning in-State tuition charges for specified honorably discharged veterans of the United States armed forces; and providing that an honorably discharged veteran of the United States armed forces is eligible for in-State tuition at public institutions of higher education in the State on presentation of specified documentation.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 51
Senate 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-106.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM