Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 410-15
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Prince George's County to file a complaint to foreclose all rights of redemption in abandoned property consisting of a vacant lot or improved property cited as vacant and unfit for habitation on a housing or building violation notice at any time after the date of sale.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2015 3/12/2015 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 43
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Second Reading Passed 43
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation 45
Senate 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-824, 14-833 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM