Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Homestead Assessment Cap Increase and Property Tax Rate Reduction - Study
Sponsored by
Delegates McIntosh, Anderson, Carter, Clippinger, Conaway, Glenn, Hammen, Harper, McHale, Oaks, Rosenberg, Stukes, Tarrant, M. Washington, and Cardin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 624
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Legislative Services to complete a study on the feasibility and effects of increasing Baltimore City's homestead property tax credit assessment cap and using the increased revenue to offset a reduction in Baltimore City's property tax rate; requiring the study to make specified estimates and to consider specified matters; requiring the Department to report findings and any recommendations on or before December 31, 2014; and providing the Act shall terminate at the end of June 30, 2015.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {845065/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 624
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {845065/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 48A
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 624
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM