Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - General - Poultry Processed in the People's Republic of China - Notice Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Barkley, Fraser-Hidalgo, Stocksdale, and Valderrama
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a food service facility that purchases a poultry product that was processed in the People's Republic of China to display on its menu, in a specified manner and location, a notice indicating the item was processed in the People's Republic of China; and requiring a grocery store that sells a poultry product that was processed in the People's Republic of China to post, in a specified manner and location, a notice indicating the item was processed in the People's Republic of China; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/14/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1001, 21-1214, 21-1216, 21-301, 21-330.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM