Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Federal Fair Housing Laws – Enforcement by State and Local Governments
Sponsored by
Delegate Impallaria
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an official of State government who has knowledge of a violation of certain federal fair housing laws taking place in the State to provide notice to the Department of Housing and Community Development of the violation; requiring a political subdivision to take certain action to enforce certain federal fair housing laws and provide certain notice to the Department under certain circumstances; requiring the Department to initiate and supervise certain enforcement actions;
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Federal Fair Housing Laws – Enforcement by State and Local Governments
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page