Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training Program
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Maryland Economic Development and Business Climate Commission) and Delegates Beitzel, Davis, Jones, Adams, Arentz, Aumann, Barkley, Branch, Brooks, Carey, Clippinger, Fisher, Frick, Glenn, S. Howard, Jameson, Kramer, Lisanti, W. Miller, Valderrama, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, and C. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training Program to increase the responsiveness of and improve customer service provided by State agencies to businesses and customers in the State; requiring the Office of the Business Ombudsman to administer and oversee the program; requiring the Office to develop standards that identify best practices for providing excellent customer service; requiring each participating agency to develop and conduct customer service training for each specified employee; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0774
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {273297/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-3)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/30 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {413629/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendment
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments {273297/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (134-3) 49
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Finance 47A
Senate 3/26/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2015 3/24/2015 Favorable 51
Senate 3/27/2015 3/24/2015 Special Order until 3/30 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 51
Senate 3/30/2015 3/25/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/30/2015 3/25/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {413629/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/30/2015 3/25/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/31/2015 3/26/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 53
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendment 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-2) 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-203, 14-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM