Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Retirement - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Barnes (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the process, benefits, and terminology for disability retirement in the State Retirement and Pension System; altering the calculation for a non-line-of-duty disability retirement allowance for specified members who file an application for a disability retirement on or after July 1, 2016; authorizing the Executive Director of the State Retirement Agency to require retirees receiving a disability retirement allowance to undergo a medical examination under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0820
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-209, 22-219, 22-220, 22-221, 22-404, 23-218, 23-222, 23-226, 23-304.1, 24-304.1, 24-401.1, 25-304.1, 26-210, 26-306.1, 26-401.1, 29-104 through 29-111, 29-113, 29-114, 29-115, 29-115.1, 29-116 through 29-118, 29-203, 38-102, 9-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM