Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unregulated Space in Hospital Operating Suites Pilot Project – Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Hill
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (41-3)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Health Services Cost Review Commission to conduct a study, in conjunction with the Maryland Health Care Commission and certain stakeholders, on the feasibility and desirability of allowing for an unregulated space in a hospital operating room as a pilot project; and requiring the Health Services Cost Review Commission to report to the Senate Finance Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee by June 30, 2020, on the results and findings of the study.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Unregulated Space in Hospital Operating Suites Pilot Project
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {536180/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Unregulated Space in Hospital Operating Suites Pilot Project – Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {963528/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (41-3)
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Unregulated Space in Hospital Operating Suites Pilot Project
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/04 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments {536180/1 Adopted 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Text - Third - Unregulated Space in Hospital Operating Suites Pilot Project – Study
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 57
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Referred Rules 59
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Hearing 4/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Adopted 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Second Reading Passed 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Floor Amendment {963528/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (41-3) 65
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM