Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board - School Counselors - Certification Renewal Requirement (Lauryn's Law)
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Angel, Atterbeary, B. Barnes, Beidle, Campos, Carozza, Carr, Chang, Cullison, Davis, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Healey, Hill, Hixson, C. Howard, S. Howard, Jalisi, Kaiser, Kelly, Lam, McComas, McDonough, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, O'Donnell, Oaks, Pendergrass, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Smith, Sophocleus, Tarlau, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, West, B. Wilson, C. Wilson, K. Young, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 467
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board to require, beginning on or before July 1, 2016, specified certificate holders applying for renewal of a certificate as a school counselor to have obtained, by a method determined by the Board, specified knowledge and skills required to understand and respond to the social, emotional, and personal development of students; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0251
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {105869/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 467
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Favorable with Amendments {105869/1 Report Adopted 59
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 60
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 57
Senate 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 467
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-704.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM