Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
SmartStat Technical Assistance and Support Center
Sponsored by
Delegates Bobo, Carr, Lafferty, McIntosh, and S. Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the SmartStat Technical Assistance and Support Center in the National Center for Smart Growth Research and Education at the University of Maryland, College Park; requiring the SmartStat Technical Assistance and Support Center to collect and organize specified data, publish the data on a specified Web site, and assist local jurisdictions in including specified indicators in specified annual reports; requiring the Governor to include in the State budget for specified years an appropriation of $150,000; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0936
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/01/2013 3/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM